judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KANTOR VS. KANTOR C/W 34185

Case Information: 33659
Short Caption:KANTOR VS. KANTOR C/W 34185Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:33659*, 34185 Related Case(s): 34185
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D220038Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/28/1999 / Holland Johnson, SusanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/14/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/25/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Theresa M. Dowling--check no. 2058.
01/25/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (SEALED). Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00482
01/28/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/01/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 10/07/98; 10/14/98; and 11/20/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Transcripttion Services. 99-00669
02/01/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (mailed on: 01/28/99). 99-00670
02/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
02/03/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent: Robert L. Eisenberg. 99-00768
02/04/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, serve and file the docketing statement. 99-00793
02/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 01/22/99. 99-00937
02/11/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter. Holland-Johnson (Notice of Association of Counsel).
03/04/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare Transcripts. 99-01521
03/08/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 11/20/98 Proceedings. Court Reporter: Helen F. Lavine. 99-01621
03/10/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Mailed on: 3/8/99). 99-01687
03/16/1999Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 99-01891
03/17/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Receipt of Copy of Transcripts. 99-01939
03/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny as moot court transcriber Deborah S. casper's motion for an extension of time to prepare and file the transcripts. This appeal is in the settlement conference program and the time period for filing transcripts was suspended. Nevertheless, we direct the clerk to file the transcripts received on March 8, 1999, forthwith. 99-02379
03/31/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Wednesday, October 7, 1998 and October 14, 1998--SEALED. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 99-01622
05/21/1999MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion of Appellant Janet Kantor to consolidate Case 33659 and Case 34185 on Appeal pursuant to N.R.A.P. 3(b). Nos. 33659, 34185 99-04213
05/24/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Appellant's Motion to Consolidate (nos. 33659 & 34185). 99-04269
06/01/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-04530
06/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. We hereby consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. Nos. 33659, 34185. 99-04607
07/09/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these appeals. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (nos. 34185/33659). 99-06120
09/20/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 9/16/99. Nos. 33659, 34185. 99-08869
09/20/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. (Nos. 33659, 34185) 99-08870
10/18/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 18, 1999 (nos. 33659 & 34185). 99-10050
11/08/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 48 pages (nos. 33659 & 34185). 99-10987
11/08/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/5/99 (nos. 33659 & 34185). 99-10988
11/08/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. (nos. 336959 & 34185). 99-10992
12/01/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address for law firm of Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg. 99-12001
12/03/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 12/23/99 (nos. 33659 & 34185). 99-12077
12/28/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 12/23/99. No. 33659, 34185. 99-13309
12/28/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. Nos. 33659, 34185. 99-13310
06/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and these appeals shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 33659, 34185. 00-10057
06/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Panel: Northern Nevada Panel. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 33659, 34185.
09/15/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." fn1[Judge Robert E. Gaston presided over the divorce proceedings, but Judge Gerald W. Hardcastle ruled on the respondent's motion for attorney's fees.] Before Young, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 96. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML Nos. 33659, 34185. 00-16285
10/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16499
10/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-16499