judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAMERON KDELL BAGLEY v. ANGELA S. BAGLEY

Case Heading (S-12-0277)
Case Number:S-12-0277Case Docketed On:12/17/2012
Linked To: S-12-0276
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:CAMERON KDELL BAGLEY v. ANGELA S. BAGLEY
Full Title:CAMERON KDELL BAGLEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. ANGELA S. BAGLEY, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCameron Kdell BagleyBret F. King
AppelleeAngela S BagleyJack Daniel Edwards

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2013 WY 126
Citation:311 P.3d 141 (Wyo. 2013)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/17/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/17/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter; and notice to attorney Bret F. King regarding e-filing requirements and service of orders.Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/05/2013Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
02/05/2013Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
02/06/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Petition Brief for Reinstatement of Appeal; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/26/2013Order - Granting Petition to Reinstate AppealOrderGrantFinal
03/04/2013Event - E-filing removed - Brief of Appellant filed before 5:00 p.m. was accepted and then removed from system because decree attached to brief was not redacted. Contacted counsel and they will re-submit.EventE-filing removedFinal
03/05/2013Brief - Appellant (considered timely filed on 3/4/2013)BriefAppellantFinal
03/06/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief; and received copy of brief on cd.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/22/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/25/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/13/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2013Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/21/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes (Volume I, pleadings; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/21/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/28/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jack D. Edwards obo Appellant Angela S. BagleyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/28/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Bret F. King obo Appellee Cameron BagleyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/18/2013Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt, Burke and Davis (Jack D. Edwards obo Appellant/Cross-Appellee; Bret F. King obo Appellee/Cross-Appellant) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/11/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, and reversing and remanding in part. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/29/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/29/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/29/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/29/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/05/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 10/31/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal