judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRANDON LEE JENSEN v. MARGARET E. MILATZO-JENSEN

Case Heading (S-12-0279)
Case Number:S-12-0279Case Docketed On:12/18/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:BRANDON LEE JENSEN v. MARGARET E. MILATZO-JENSEN
Full Title:BRANDON LEE JENSEN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MARGARET E. MILATZO-JENSEN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrandon Lee JensenBrandon Lee Jensen
AppelleeMargaret E. Milatzo-JensenWallace L. Stock
Lance T. Harmon

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contempt
Opinion Number:2013 WY 83
Citation:304 P.3d 969

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/18/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/18/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/18/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/16/2013Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/30/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/30/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Brandon L. JensenEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/19/2013Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
03/20/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/20/2013Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/26/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes (pleadings volumes 3 & 4 from appeal numbers S-12-0080 & S-12-0083; and new volumes, Volume 1, pleadings; Volume 2, confidential file; Volume 3, transcripts)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/26/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/05/2013Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/10/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/26/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/26/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/26/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/26/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/30/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 7/29/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal