judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOEL RANDY FERGUSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0278)
Case Number:S-12-0278Case Docketed On:12/17/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JOEL RANDY FERGUSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOEL RANDY FERGUSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoel Randy FergusonDiane M. Lozano
Patricia Lynn Bennett
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
Jeffrey Scott Pope
Jennifer Eve Zissou

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2013 WY 117
Citation:309 P.3d 831

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/17/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
12/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/01/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/04/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/04/2013Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/20/2013Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearanceNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/20/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/21/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance - Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas, Assistant Public Defender, to appear on behalf of appellant; and received hardcopy of Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/21/2013Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/02/2013Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
04/03/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Withdraw (Public Defender Appellate Division)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/03/2013Order - Allowing Withdrawal of CounselOrderOtherFinal
05/06/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/07/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/17/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/18/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and copy of designated record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/26/2013Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/02/2013Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
07/08/2013Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/09/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/09/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2013Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/11/2013Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearanceNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
07/12/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jennifer Zissou obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/15/2013Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
07/15/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes (Volume 1, pleadings; Volume 2a, pleadings; Volume 2b, jury instructions & verdict; Volume 2c-d, transcripts; Volume 2e, confidential folder)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/15/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/15/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance - Patricia L. Bennett obo AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/16/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion and Affidavit of Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas to Withdraw as Counsel of Record; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/16/2013Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas withdrawn as cousel and Patricia L. Bennett is substituted as counsel for AppellantOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
08/05/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Patricia Bennett obo appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/21/2013Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt, Burke and Davis (Patricia Lynn Bennett obo Appellant; Jennifer Eve Zissou obo Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/30/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/16/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/16/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/21/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 10/18/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal