judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JERELE CRAIG COTHREN, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0270)
Case Number:S-12-0270Case Docketed On:12/13/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JERELE CRAIG COTHREN, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JERELE CRAIG COTHREN, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJerele Craig Cothren Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
Theodore R. Racines
Christyne Marie Martens

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea, Criminal Law -Sentencing, Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2013 WY 125
Citation:310 P.3d 908

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/13/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/30/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/31/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/19/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/19/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/08/2013Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/08/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/09/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/12/2013Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/16/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes (Volume I, pleadings; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, appellate record in S-11-0240)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/17/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Eric M. Alden, obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/30/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Christyne Martens obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/21/2013Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt, Burke and Davis (Eric M. Alden obo Appellant; Christyne M. Martens obo Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/10/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding. Justice Davis writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/28/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/28/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/28/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/28/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/31/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/29/2013.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal