judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6771
A-6771
03/27/1958
Application for Writ of Error
ELVIS W. MEINERS
TEXAS OSAGE COOPERATIVE ROYALTY POOL, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/29/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/29/1958Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/17/1958Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/11/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
03/27/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/05/1958Response to Motion filed
05/29/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/29/1958Response to Brief filed
04/17/1958Reply to Response
04/11/1958Response to Petition
03/27/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/27/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Elvis W. MeinersPetitioner
Texas Osage Cooperative Royalty Pool, Inc., et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information