judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JASON JAMES JORESKI v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0066)
Case Number:S-12-0066Case Docketed On:03/21/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JASON JAMES JORESKI v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JASON JAMES JORESKI, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJason James JoreskiDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Joshua Eames

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Constitutional Law - Federal, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 143
Citation:288 P.3d 413

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/21/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/21/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/21/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/08/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/08/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/08/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/20/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for second extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/10/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/10/2012Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
08/10/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/13/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Designation of Record on Appeal and Consent and Approval for Joshua EamesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/16/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/29/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from district court.Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/29/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/04/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/04/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/02/2012Order - Other - Order Assigning Justice (Justice Golden, retired, assigned to act in this matter)OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/14/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/30/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/30/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/04/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 12/3/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal