judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCCORMACK VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 33650
Short Caption:MCCORMACK VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - J71199Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/21/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Petition for a Writ of Review (NRA 34.020). (Filed via FAX) 99-00411
01/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
01/21/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Filing Fee; 8 copies of writ; affidavit; proof of service (parites and Judge); copy of judgment; written order; minute order or portion of transcript. Due Date: 10 days.
01/25/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Errata re: Petition for a Writ of Review. 99-00477
01/26/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Donn Ianuzi--Western Union M.O. no. 02279315060,
01/26/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Petition for a Writ of Review (NRS 34.020) (original) (Filed via FAX on 1/12/99). 99-00514
01/27/1999MotionFiled Motion. Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel and Emergency Motion for Stay of Order to Show Cause. 99-00580
01/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The emergency motion filed with the petition for writ of review and the emergency motion filed on January 27, 1999, are denied. The petition for writ of review remains pending. This court shall determine, at a later date, whether an answer to the petition is warranted. 99-00587
01/28/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing (Petition for a Writ of Review) 99-00619
01/28/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing (Emergency Motion for Stay) 99-00620
01/29/1999MotionFiled Motion. Request for Judicial Notice of Order Entered by District Court. 99-00656
02/01/1999MotionFiled Motion. Errata re: Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court's Order for Invasive Blood Tests, Urine Tests, and Hair Tests on Non-Party to Litigation and Order for Attorney Sanctions. 99-00686
02/01/1999MotionFiled Motion. Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel and Emergency Motion for Stay of Order to Show Cause. (Original--no original received on 1/27/99). 99-00692
02/01/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Donn Ianuzi re: request for transcripts. 99-00693
02/05/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Amber McCormack. 99-00837
02/08/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in which to Provide Transcripts or, in the Alternative, Motion for Order Preparing Transcripts. 99-00871
02/09/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-00905
02/22/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Request for Judicial Notice of Filing of Transcript with the Eighth Judicial District Court. 99-01185
02/22/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The transcripts submitted on Febraury 22, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. Petitioner's February 22, 1999, "Request for Judicial Notice of Filing of Transcript with the Eighth Judicial District Court" is denied as moot. 99-01186
02/22/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/20/99 and 1/28/99. Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 99-01187
02/25/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. State's Response to Writ of Review. 99-01297
03/03/1999MotionFiled Motion. Petitioner's Motion for Leave of Court to File Traverse. 99-01511
03/11/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. State's Response to Petitioner's Motion for Leave of Court to File Transverse. 99-01733
04/08/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 01/05/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 99-02674
04/08/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Judgment: "We deny this petition". [3] We deny all unresolved motions by petitioner and real party in interest. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-02675
04/15/1999MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay of Remittitur. 99-02931
05/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On April 8, 1999, we denied petitioner's application for a writ of review. On April 15, 1999, petitioner filed a motion for stay of the remittitur pending application to the United States Supreme Court for a writ of certiorari. We deny the motion. 99-04066
05/19/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-04103
05/19/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned, unfiled, "Submission of Transcript " and "Certificate of Mailing" to attorney Donn Ianuzi per D.L. 99-04549