judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

M. S. STEVENS, ET AL. v. CITY OF DALLAS

Case: A-6810
A-6810
04/15/1958
Application for Writ of Error
M. S. STEVENS, ET AL.
CITY OF DALLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
05/28/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/03/1958Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/24/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
04/15/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
06/04/1958Response to Motion filed
05/28/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/03/1958Reply to Response
04/24/1958Response to Petition
04/15/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/15/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of DallasRespondent
M. S. Stevens, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information