judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER D. BALDERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0267)
Case Number:S-12-0267Case Docketed On:12/06/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER D. BALDERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER D. BALDERSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher D. BaldersonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
Theodore R. Racines
Christyne Marie Martens

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2013 WY 107
Citation:309 P.3d 809

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/06/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/06/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/18/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/22/2013Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/22/2013Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/11/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/12/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/30/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/20/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/21/2013Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/28/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes (Volume I-II, court pleadings; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, exhibits; Volume V, confidential folder)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/28/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/03/2013Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/17/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Davis writing for the Court. No copy sent to Warden, Appellant has been paroledOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/03/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/03/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/11/2013Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/30/2013Notice-Internal - Other - opinion corrected to fix error in Starrett citation in paragraph 24Notice-InternalOtherFinal