judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JESUS ANTONIO GONZALEZ-OCHOA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0281)
Case Number:S-12-0281Case Docketed On:12/21/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - General Provisions 6-1-101 - 6-1-304
Short Title:JESUS ANTONIO GONZALEZ-OCHOA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JESUS ANTONIO GONZALEZ-OCHOA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJesus Antonio Gonzalez-OchoaDiane M. Lozano
Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas
AppelleeThe State of WyomingDavid L. Delicath
Jeffrey Scott Pope
Peter K. Michael
Jennifer Eve Zissou

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2014 WY 14
Citation:317 P.3d 599

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/21/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/21/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/21/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/15/2013Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearanceNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
01/16/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance - Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas for Appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/05/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/06/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's First, Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/06/2013Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/20/2013Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
02/21/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Withdraw; and proposed orderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/21/2013Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
03/25/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/26/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; and proposed orderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2013Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/08/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/09/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/09/2013Order - Grant - third extension of time (no further extensions of time will be considered)OrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
06/24/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/25/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/12/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/13/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/28/2013Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/04/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jennifer Zissou obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/06/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/09/2013Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk regarding missing arraignment transcript. Clerk will send record without the transcript, and will attempt to obtain another transcript.EventPhone CallFinal
09/12/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, five volumes, Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II - III, Confidential Files; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/12/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/02/2013Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk re missing Arraignment transcript; Court Reporter (retired) is having notes retrieved and will prepare transcript ASAPEventPhone CallFinal
10/07/2013Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt, Burke and Davis (Elisabeth Trefonas appearing on behalf of Appellant; Jennifer Zissou appearing on behalf of Appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/16/2013Record - Other - Received missing arraignment trancript and placed in Volume IV.RecordOtherFinal
01/27/2014Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/12/2014Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/12/2014Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/12/2014Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/12/2014Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/14/2014Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 2/13/14ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal