judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JOSEPH O. HAYES v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-12-0280)
Case Number:S-12-0280Case Docketed On:12/19/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JOSEPH O. HAYES v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JOSEPH O. HAYES, Appellant (Petitioner/Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoseph O HayesEthelyn (Lynn) Boak
AppelleeDepartment of Workforce Services - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
John D. Rossetti
Michael J. Finn
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2013 WY 96
Citation:307 P.3d 843 (Wyo. 2013)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/19/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/19/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/19/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/29/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/31/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Request for Extension of Time to File Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/31/2013Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/11/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/12/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/13/2013Notice-Incoming - Appellant's Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
03/28/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/28/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/04/2013Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/16/2013Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/22/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes (Volume I, court pleadings; Volume II, agency record)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/22/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/13/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/16/2013Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/20/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Attorney Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/03/2013Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
09/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/03/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/03/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/05/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 9/4/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal