judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RALPH LAVERNE HUNNICUTT-CARTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0271)
Case Number:S-12-0271Case Docketed On:12/13/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:RALPH LAVERNE HUNNICUTT-CARTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RALPH LAVERNE HUNNICUTT-CARTER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRalph Laverne Hunnicutt-CarterDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
Theodore R. Racines
Darrell Duane Jackson
Emily N. Thomas
Courtney Gilbert

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure
Opinion Number:2013 WY 103
Citation:308 P.3d 847

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/13/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/30/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/31/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/19/2013Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
03/19/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/19/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and Approval for Darrell D. Jackson, Faculty Director; Emily N. Thomas, Student Director; and Courtney Gilbert, Student Intern to appear on behalf of the State of Wyoming.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/19/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/09/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/12/2013Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/17/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from David E. Westling obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/19/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential File.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/19/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/29/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Courtney Gilbert, Student Intern obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/22/2013Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justice Hill, Voigt, Burke and Davis (David E. Westling obo Appellant; Theodore Racines, Courtney Gilbert, argument by Ms. Gilbert, obo Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/29/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Davis writing for the courtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/16/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/16/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/20/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 9/18/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal