judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHARLES FREDERICK SECREST v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0263)
Case Number:S-12-0263Case Docketed On:12/03/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHARLES FREDERICK SECREST v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHARLES FREDERICK SECREST, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCharles Frederick SecrestDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
Theodore R. Racines
Darrell Duane Jackson
Emily N. Thomas
Jared D. Holbrook

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Jury trial rights
Opinion Number:2013 WY 102
Citation:310 P.3d 882

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/03/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
12/03/2012Order - Sanction - notice of appeal (Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas)OrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
12/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/07/2012Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
01/17/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/18/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/18/2013Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/08/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/08/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/25/2013Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
04/25/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/26/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and ApprovalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/26/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and copy of Certification Regarding Designated Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/14/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2013Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/29/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jarod Holbrook obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/30/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes (Volume I-II, pleadings; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, confidential file)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/30/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/30/2013Event - Phone Call to Court Reporter re trial transcript; she is going to split into three and sent certified copy.EventPhone CallFinal
06/03/2013Record - Received Certified Copy of Trial Transcripts, divided into three volumes.RecordOtherFinal
06/04/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Eric M. Alden obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/19/2013Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justice Hill, Voigt, Burke and Davis (Eric Alden obo Appellant; David Delicath, Jared D. Holbrook, argument by Mr. Holbrook, obo Appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/29/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the courtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/16/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/19/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 9/17/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal