judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CALEB A. HUYCK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0262)
Case Number:S-12-0262Case Docketed On:11/30/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Mandamus
Short Title:CALEB A. HUYCK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CALEB A. HUYCK, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerCaleb Andrew Huyck Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/30/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/30/2012Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
11/30/2012Petition - Writ - review (unredacted attachments not included)PetitionWrit - reviewFinal
11/30/2012Correspondence - Outgoing. Requesting Petitioner to provide an original copy of signature page.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
12/06/2012Event - Phone Call from AG's office - They will not be responding to petition.EventPhone CallFinal
12/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received, signature pageEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/18/2012Order - Petition for review - deny (Order denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus)OrderPetition for review - denyFinal
12/18/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/18/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 1/17/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal