Case: 03-98-00393-CV
03-98-00393-CV
07/23/1998
Mandamus
In re T. Robert Shugrue
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/09/2005 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
12/23/1999 | Case stored | | |
07/30/1998 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
07/24/1998 | MOTION TEMPORARY RELIEF DISPOSED | Motion or Writ Denied | |
07/23/1998 | miscellaneous motion filed | | |
07/23/1998 | Affidavit filed | | |
07/23/1998 | brief in support of | | |
07/23/1998 | Petition for writ of mandamus | | |
07/23/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/30/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hendren, G. Ray | Respondent | Mr. R. David Fritsche |
Williams, Bill | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
Bain, Patrick | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
Sherwood, Steve | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
Hanigan, Janiceonorable J. Dav | Respondent | Mr. R. David Fritsche |
Reno, Janet | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
Cook, Charlotte | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
Dessau-park Inc. | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
Clayton Williams Sherwood, Inc | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
Bisbee, Shirley | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
Clayton, Jim | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
Sparks, Sam | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
Monroe, Frank R. | Respondent | Mr. R. David Fritsche |
Phillips, J. Dav | Respondent | Mr. R. David Fritsche |
Breland, Jan | Respondent | Mr. R. David Fritsche |
Shugrue, T. Robert | Relator | |
Naranjo, Orlinda | Respondent | Mr. R. David Fritsche |
Copeland, Laura | Respondent | Mr. William David Deaderick |
C.w.s. Dessau Associates | Respondent | Mr. R. David Fritsche |
Trial Court Information
Honorable J. David Phillips