judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEVY VS. 8TH JUD DIST CT

Case Information: 33636
Short Caption:LEVY VS. 8TH JUD DIST CTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 31096
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141597Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Returned check no. 13356 to attorney Frank J. Cremen.
01/19/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Writ of Mandate. 99-00356
01/19/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandate. 99-00357
01/20/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit of the party beneficially interested. Due Date: 10 days
01/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Frank J. Creman (mailed on: 01/22/99). 99-00472
02/01/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Gregory R. Hojnowski is representing real party in interest (mailed on: 01/25/99). 99-00668
03/11/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Judgment: " . . . we deny the petition." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-01728
04/06/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-02575
04/06/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.