judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TREVOR C. LAKE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0055)
Case Number:S-12-0055Case Docketed On:03/14/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:TREVOR C. LAKE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TREVOR C. LAKE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTrevor C. LakeDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2013 WY 7
Citation:292 P.3d 174

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/14/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/14/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/14/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/26/2012Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearanceNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/29/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance from Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas obo AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/30/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/01/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's first motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/01/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/14/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/15/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2012Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/01/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/02/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/15/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/21/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/28/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/29/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/29/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I and II - Pleadings; Volume III - Confidential folder; Volume IV - Transcripts and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/29/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/02/2012Order - Other - Order Assigning Justice (Justice Golden, retired, assigned to act in this matter)OrderOtherFinal
01/17/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden, Retired writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/04/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/04/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/04/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/04/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/07/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 2/5/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal