judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ARUNDEL RESEARCH CORPORATION v. PUMA SERVICES, INC., d/b/a PUMA STEEL

Case Heading (S-12-0265)
Case Number:S-12-0265Case Docketed On:12/05/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:ARUNDEL RESEARCH CORPORATION v. PUMA SERVICES, INC., d/b/a PUMA STEEL
Full Title:ARUNDEL RESEARCH CORPORATION, Appellant (Defendant), v. PUMA SERVICES, INC., d/b/a PUMA STEEL, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantArundel Research CorporationPhilip A. Nicholas
Julie M. (Wickett) Edwards
AppelleePuma Services, Inc., d/b/a Puma SteelNicholas G. J. Healey
Timothy Lance Woznick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/05/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/05/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/05/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Other - Notice to counsel regarding e-filing and service of orders sent to Julie Wickett and Nicholas Healey.Notice-OutgoingOtherFinal
12/05/2012Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Davis recusedNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/15/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/16/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/16/2013Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/27/2013Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
03/04/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to Rule 18 W.R.A.P.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2013Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/04/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal