judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KELVIN BOURKE v. GREY WOLF DRILLING COMPANY, LP, now known as PRECISION DRILLING COMPANY, LP

Case Heading (S-12-0258)
Case Number:S-12-0258Case Docketed On:11/29/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:KELVIN BOURKE v. GREY WOLF DRILLING COMPANY, LP, now known as PRECISION DRILLING COMPANY, LP
Full Title:KELVIN BOURKE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. GREY WOLF DRILLING COMPANY, LP, now known as PRECISION DRILLING COMPANY, LP, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKelvin BourkeHampton McCracken Young Jr.
AppelleeGrey Wolf Drilling Company, LP, n/k/a Precision Drilling Company, LPAmanda Wiley DeWick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Venue
Opinion Number:2013 WY 93
Citation:305 P.3d 1164

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/29/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/29/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/29/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/29/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/29/2012Notice-Outgoing - Other - Notice to counsel regarding mandatory e-filing and service of orders sent to Ms. Wiley.Notice-OutgoingOtherFinal
01/14/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/16/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/27/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/28/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/08/2013Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/14/2013Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/15/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/18/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/18/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Hampton M. Young, Jr. obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/22/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume of pleadingsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/22/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/02/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Amanda Wiley obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/17/2013Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
04/17/2013Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt, Burke and Davis (Hampton M. Young, Jr. for Appellant; Amanda W. Wiley for Appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/18/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/31/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding. Justice Davis writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/16/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/16/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/16/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/21/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 8/19/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal