judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE FOUNDATION, a Wyoming non-profit corporation, and NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE ALLIANCE, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, INDUSTRIAL SITING DIVISION, and WASATCH WIND INTERMOUNTAIN, LLC d/b/a Pioneer Windpark I, LLC, and Pioneer Windpark II, LLC

Case Heading (S-12-0061)
Case Number:S-12-0061Case Docketed On:03/16/2012
Linked To: S-12-0060
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE FOUNDATION, a Wyoming non-profit corporation, and NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE ALLIANCE, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, INDUSTRIAL SITING DIVISION, and WASATCH WIND INTERMOUNTAIN, LLC d/b/a Pioneer Windpark I, LLC, and Pioneer Windpark II, LLC
Full Title:NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE FOUNDATION, a Wyoming non-profit corporation, and NORTHERN LARAMIE RANGE ALLIANCE, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, Appellants (Petitioners), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, INDUSTRIAL SITING DIVISION, and WASATCH WIND INTERMOUNTAIN, LLC d/b/a Pioneer Windpark I, LLC, and Pioneer Windpark II, LLC, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNorthern Laramie Range Foundation, a Wyoming nonprofitPeter C. Nicolaysen
Pamala M. Brondos
AppellantNorthern Laramie Range Alliance, a Wyoming nonprofitPeter C. Nicolaysen
Pamala M. Brondos
AppelleeDepartment of Environmental Quality - Industrial Siting DivisionGregory A. Phillips
Jay Arthur Jerde
Lucas James Esch
AppelleeWasatch Wind Intermountain, LLCBrent R. Kunz
Lucas Evan Buckley
John A. Masterson
Alaina M. Stedillie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Natural Resources
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/16/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/16/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/19/2012Service - Mail returned. Docketing letters sent to Appellants returned for insufficient postage. Due date for brief recalculated and resent.ServiceMail returnedFinal
05/04/2012Brief - Appellant and Statement of CostsBriefAppellantFinal
05/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants Northern Laramie Range Foundation and Northern Laramie Range Alliance, LLC; Statement of Costs; and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2012Brief - Appellee (Wasatch Wind Intermountain, LLC)BriefAppelleeFinal
06/20/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Response Brief of Respondent Washatch Wind Intermountain, LLC, d/b/a Pioneer Wind Park I, LLC and Pioneer Wind Park II, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Wyoming Department of Environmental Quality, Industrial Siting DivisionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellants Northern Laramie Range Foundation, Northern Laramie Range Alliance, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/13/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Agency Record - containing 2 boxes.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/25/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Peter C. Nicolaysen obo AppellantsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/06/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from John A. Masterson obo Appellee Wasatch WindNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Luke J. Esch obo Appellee, DEQNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/22/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke (Pamela M. Brondos and Peter C. Nicolaysen, argument by Mr. Nicolaysen for Appellants; Lucas James Esch, for Wyoming DEQ; and John A. Masterson, Alaina Marie Stedillie, argument by Mr. Masterson for AppelleeWasatch Wind) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/14/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/03/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/03/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/08/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 1/7/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal