judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL JESSE MUNOZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0260)
Case Number:S-12-0260Case Docketed On:11/30/2012
Linked To: S-12-0259
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MICHAEL JESSE MUNOZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL JESSE MUNOZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael Jesse MunozDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
Theodore R. Racines

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/30/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/30/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/16/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/17/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/17/2013Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/20/2013Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
02/21/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/21/2013Order - Dismiss appeal - voluntaryOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
02/21/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal