judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES v. LISA KISLING

Case Heading (S-12-0256)
Case Number:S-12-0256Case Docketed On:11/26/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES v. LISA KISLING
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, Appellant (Respondent), v. LISA KISLING, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Family ServicesGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley
AppelleeLisa KislingJohn Mortensen Burman
Ethan Doak
Matthew Pennell

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure
Opinion Number:2013 WY 91
Citation:305 P.3d 1157

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/26/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/26/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/26/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/14/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/14/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant (Respondent), Wyoming Department of Family Services; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/04/2013Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Ethan Doak to appear in this matterNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
03/08/2013Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/08/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/12/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Robin Sessions Cooley obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/13/2013Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Matthew Pennell to appear on behalf of AppelleeNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
03/14/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Consent of Client for Ethan Doak to appear on behalf of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/14/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Consent of Client for Matthew Pennell to appear of behalf of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/20/2013Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/20/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant, Wyoming Department of Family ServicesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/21/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/27/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting by Ethan Doak, Student Director and John M. Burman obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/28/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two Volumes; Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record (two volumes)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/28/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/02/2013Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Barton R. Voigt recusedNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
04/04/2013Order - Assignment of judge - Judge Dennis L. Sanderson assigned to act in this matterOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
04/10/2013Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
04/12/2013Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
04/12/2013Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/15/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Vacate and Reshedule Oral ArgumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2013Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant, will appear at oral argumentEventPhone CallFinal
05/21/2013Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Burke, Davis and District Judge Sanderson (Robin S. Cooley, Jill Kucera, argument by Ms. Cooley obo Appellant; John M. Burman, Ethan Doak, argument by Mr. Doak obo Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/24/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/09/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/09/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/09/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/09/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/12/2013Notice-Outgoing - Amended Mandate reversing judgment of district courtNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/15/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 8/13/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal