judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMOTHY JAMES HEINDL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0057)
Case Number:S-12-0057Case Docketed On:03/14/2012
Linked To: S-12-0056
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:TIMOTHY JAMES HEINDL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TIMOTHY JAMES HEINDL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimothy James HeindlDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/14/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/14/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/14/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/27/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed orderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/30/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/12/2012Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
06/13/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/13/2012Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated (order posted in S-12-0056)OrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
06/13/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal