judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: GORDON R. BILYEU, AN EMPLOYEE OF BABCOCK & WILCOX CONSTRUCTION v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-12-0051)
Case Number:S-12-0051Case Docketed On:03/13/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: GORDON R. BILYEU, AN EMPLOYEE OF BABCOCK & WILCOX CONSTRUCTION v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: GORDON R. BILYEU, AN EMPLOYEE OF BABCOCK & WILCOX CONSTRUCTION, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGordon R. BilyeuAndrew Frederick Sears
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
John D. Rossetti
Michael J. Finn
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 141
Citation:287 P.3d 773 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/13/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/13/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/23/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/25/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/01/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/01/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/04/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/14/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/15/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/20/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/20/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/20/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/02/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/13/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
11/15/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs; and copy of proposed orderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/04/2012Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
12/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/04/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/06/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/5/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal