judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEREZ (CARLOS) VS. STATE C/W 34647

Case Information: 34646
Short Caption:PEREZ (CARLOS) VS. STATE C/W 34647Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34646*, 34647
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982448Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/10/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07344
08/13/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 7/7/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Lee M. Bahr (nos. 34646 & 34647 - placed in 34646). 99-07546
08/26/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals (nos. 34646/34647). 99-07973
09/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. On August 26, 1999, the parties filed a stipulation to consolidate these appeals. The stipulation is approved. These appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. A single fast track statement shall be filed for both cases within 20 days of this order. Nos. 34646, 34647. 99-08380
09/07/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Nos. 34646, 34647. 99-08384
09/07/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Nos. 34646, 34647. 99-08385
09/28/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. (nos. 34646 & 34647) 99-09275
11/17/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeals. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML Nos. 34646, 34647. 99-11395
12/14/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12560
12/14/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/05/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2000. 99-12560