judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WEST AMERICA HOUSING CORPORATION, a Wyoming corporation, and JEANNE JOELSON v. VANDON, INC., a Wyoming corporation, and DONALD PEARSON, also known as DONALD E. PEARSON

Case Heading (S-07-0071)
Case Number:S-07-0071Case Docketed On:03/29/2007
Linked To: S-07-0068
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:WEST AMERICA HOUSING CORPORATION, a Wyoming corporation, and JEANNE JOELSON v. VANDON, INC., a Wyoming corporation, and DONALD PEARSON, also known as DONALD E. PEARSON
Full Title:WEST AMERICA HOUSING CORPORATION, a Wyoming corporation, and JEANNE JOELSON, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. VANDON, INC., a Wyoming corporation, and DONALD PEARSON, also known as DONALD E. PEARSON, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWest America Housing CorporationEthelyn (Lynn) Boak
AppellantJeanne L. JoelsonEthelyn (Lynn) Boak
AppelleeVandon, Inc., a Wyoming corporationWilliam W. Harden
AppelleeDonald PearsonWilliam W. Harden

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 62
Citation:185 P.3d 19 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/29/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/29/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/02/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
04/17/2007Order - Denying motion to dismiss appeal.OrderDenyFinal
05/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearanceNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/11/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/11/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/08/2007Correspondence - Incoming from Joni Hines, Court Reporter regarding transcripts. She has not received payment.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/08/2007Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant re letter from Court Reporter; will make a copy and sent it to herEventPhone CallFinal
06/27/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/27/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/08/2007Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
08/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
08/10/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/10/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/26/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/26/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/18/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/19/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - no further extensions.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/20/2007Brief - Appellants; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
11/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
12/21/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/27/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel for appellantsMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
01/04/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/11/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/16/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/23/2008Order - Deny motion to withdraw as counselOrderDenyFinal
05/06/2008Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from Jeanne Joelson regarding the real estate deal with Mr. Pearson. No action necessary.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/05/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/23/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/25/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal