judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MCCLEAN, JEROME G. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1356
Short Caption:MCCLEAN, JEROME G. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F339-80Filed Date:11/17/1980

Opening Event Date:11/17/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/21/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/16/1983
Argued/Submitted:04/13/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCCLEAN, JEROME G. UNITED STATES
11/17/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/21/1981FiledRecord Completed
02/16/1983FiledBriefing Completed
04/13/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/21/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition