judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CHARLES B. JOHNSON v. PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case: B-4559
B-4559
04/09/1974
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLES B. JOHNSON
PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
01/23/1975Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/10/1974Letter brief Respondent
04/24/1974Letter brief Petitioner
04/23/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
04/09/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
01/27/1975Response to Motion filed
01/23/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/08/1975Dissenting opinion issued.
01/08/1975Opinion issued
10/10/1974Letter brief
06/26/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1974Document received (See Remarks)
04/24/1974Letter brief
04/23/1974Response to Petition
04/09/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/09/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles B. JohnsonPetitioner
Prudential Insurance Company of AmericaRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information