judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAILEY, ALVIN LEE UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1388
Short Caption:DAILEY, ALVIN LEE UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F337-80Filed Date:11/25/1980

Opening Event Date:11/25/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/09/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/31/1983
Argued/Submitted:02/07/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Linda J. RavdinNN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Colleen M. Kennedy YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAILEY, ALVIN LEE UNITED STATES
11/25/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/09/1981FiledRecord Completed
10/31/1983FiledBriefing Completed
02/07/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/13/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition