judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRANK W. SYMINGTON v. BANU E. SYMINGTON

Case Heading (S-07-0044)
Case Number:S-07-0044Case Docketed On:02/26/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:FRANK W. SYMINGTON v. BANU E. SYMINGTON
Full Title:FRANK W. SYMINGTON, Appellant (Defendant), v. BANU E. SYMINGTON, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrank W. SymingtonRobert J. O'Neil
AppelleeBanu E. SymingtonMark W. Gifford

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 154
Citation:167 P.3d 658

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/26/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
02/26/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/26/2007Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
03/22/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
04/11/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
04/11/2007Memorandum - In support of motionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
04/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/13/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/01/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/01/2007Order - Deny. Order denying motion to dismiss appeal.OrderDenyFinal
06/04/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/04/2007Notice-Internal - Other, GAL removed from case, allowed to withdraw in district courtNotice-InternalOtherFinal
06/05/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/20/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/25/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/11/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/17/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/15/07 by B. Bridewell.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal