Case: WR-33,076-04
WR-33,076-04
06/11/1998
1107-HC
EUSTACE, MICHAEL KEVIN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/09/1998 | MISC DOCU RECD | | |
07/08/1998 | MISC DOCU RECD | | |
07/01/1998 | ACTION TAKEN | HC relief denied WITHOUT written order. | |
07/01/1998 | ACTION TAKEN | HC relief denied WITHOUT written order. | |
06/24/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
06/24/1998 | MISC DOCU RECD | | |
06/11/1998 | HC WRIT RECEIVED | | |
06/11/1998 | WRIT RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/01/1998 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Eustace, Michael Kevin | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
525350-C