judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DANIEL CURTIS v. HON. DAN GIBBS, JERRI ELLEN SPENCER

Case: B-4518
B-4518
03/18/1974
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
DANIEL CURTIS
HON. DAN GIBBS, JERRI ELLEN SPENCER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
04/23/1974Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
04/17/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
04/11/1974Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
04/10/1974Post submission brief filedRelator
04/08/1974Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
03/27/1974Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondent
03/27/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
03/19/1974Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
03/19/1974Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
03/19/1974Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
07/01/1974Order from Lower Court filed
06/11/1974Order from Lower Court filed
05/22/1974Opinion issued
04/23/1974Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/17/1974Response to Petition
04/11/1974Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/10/1974Post submission brief filed
04/08/1974Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/04/1974Order from Lower Court filed
03/27/1974Order from Lower Court filed
03/27/1974Exhibits in case/cause filed
03/27/1974Response to Petition
03/27/1974Order from Lower Court filed
03/20/1974Order from Lower Court filed
03/19/1974Brief in Support of Petition
03/19/1974Exhibits in case/cause filed
03/19/1974Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
03/18/1974Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. Dan GibbsRespondent
Daniel CurtisRelator
Jerri Ellen SpencerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information