Offender Information Details
SID Number:
08289549
TDCJ Number:
01807744
Name:
HOBGOOD,HERBERT
Race:
W
Gender:
M
DOB:
1991-08-20
Maximum Sentence Date:
2026-01-21
Current Facility:
DOLPH BRISCOE
Projected Release Date:
2026-01-21
Parole Eligibility Date:
2019-01-21
Offender Visitation Eligible:
YES
Information provided is updated once daily during weekdays and multiple times per day
on visitation days. Because this information is subject to change, family members and
friends are encouraged to call the unit prior to traveling for a visit.
on visitation days. Because this information is subject to change, family members and
friends are encouraged to call the unit prior to traveling for a visit.
SPECIAL INFORMATION FOR SCHEDULED RELEASE:
Scheduled Release Date:
Offender is not scheduled for release at this time.
Scheduled Release Type:
Will be determined when release date is scheduled.
Scheduled Release Location:
Will be determined when release date is scheduled.
Offense History:
Offense Date | Offense | Sentence Date | County | Case No. | Sentence (YY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
2009-09-08 | SEX ASLT CHILD | 2012-08-10 | UPSHUR | 15,452 | 14-00-00 |