judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES C. McCALLIE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-13-0099)
Case Number:S-13-0099Case Docketed On:05/09/2013
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:JAMES C. McCALLIE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:JAMES C. McCALLIE, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames C. McCallieDana Jill Lent
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationRobin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Jackson Matthew Engels
Peter K. Michael

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2014 WY 18
Citation:317 P.3d 1142

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/09/2013Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/09/2013Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/09/2013Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/09/2013Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/25/2013Brief - Appellant (system rejected scanned documents, advised counsel to attach to hard copies only)BriefAppellantFinal
06/26/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/12/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/12/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Department of Transportation; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/22/2013Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/04/2013Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/11/2013Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/11/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II (not designated or sent); Volume III, Agency Record and Audiotapes; Volume IV, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/04/2014Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/20/2014Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/20/2014Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/20/2014Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/20/2014Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/26/2014Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/24/2014.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal