Case: 07-99-00444-CR
07-99-00444-CR
10/22/1999
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Ruben Martinez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/03/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/03/2001 | Motion to Publish Opinion Disposed | | |
05/03/2001 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
04/20/2001 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
04/18/2001 | Motion to Publish Opinion Filed | | |
04/10/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/10/2001 | Submitted | | |
03/19/2001 | Sent 21 day notice | | |
03/02/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/02/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
02/01/2000 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | GRANT | |
12/31/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
12/03/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
12/03/1999 | Opinion issued | GRANT | |
12/03/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
12/01/1999 | Motion to Withdraw Attorney Filed | | |
10/22/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
10/22/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/22/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/03/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Martinez, Ruben | Criminal - Appellant | Joseph W. Kline |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Wade Jackson |
Trial Court Information
237th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Samuel Abel Medina
98-429,045
45 yrs, TDC