judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4540
B-4540
03/27/1974
Application for Writ of Error
7-UP BOTTLING COMPANY OF AUSTIN, INC.
CAPITAL NATIONAL BANK OF AUSTIN, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF EDMUND PERY KNEBEL, DECEASED., MRS. A. G. (PEARL) SAEGERT, MRS. EMMA KNEBEL AND PAUL B. KNEBEL, JR., HERBERT KNEBEL, MRS. LAURA MARBURGER, ROLAND V. KNEBEL AND MRS. EMMA HABERLIEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/24/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/30/1974Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/26/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
04/19/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
04/10/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
03/27/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/29/1974Response to Motion filed
07/29/1974Response to Motion filed
07/24/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/30/1974Reply to Response
04/26/1974Response to Petition
04/19/1974Response to Petition
04/10/1974Response to Petition
04/04/1974Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
04/01/1974Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
03/27/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Capital National Bank of Austin, Independent Executor of the Estate of Edmund Pery Knebel, deceased.Respondent
Mrs. A. G. (Pearl) Saegert, Mrs. Emma Knebel and Paul B. Knebel, Jr.Respondent
Herbert Knebel, Mrs. Laura Marburger, Roland V. Knebel and Mrs. Emma HaberlienRespondent
7-Up Bottling Company of Austin, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information