judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4563
B-4563
04/10/1974
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN S. YOUNG, ET UX.
ELMER C. GARDNER, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/31/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/01/1974Response to PetitionPetitioner
04/29/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
04/10/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
04/10/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/02/1974Conditional motion for rehearing
07/31/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/01/1974Response to Petition
04/29/1974Response to Petition
04/10/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/10/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/10/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John S. Young, et ux.Petitioner
Elmer C. Gardner, et ux.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information