judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

In re Delilah Ojeda, Individually and as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Ralph Ojeda, Deceased, and as Next Friend of Elizabeth Ojeda and Ralph Ojeda, Jr., and Renee Neary

Case: 02-99-00350-CV
02-99-00350-CV
11/04/1999
Mandamus
In re Delilah Ojeda, Individually and as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Ralph Ojeda, Deceased, and as Next Friend of Elizabeth Ojeda and Ralph Ojeda, Jr., and Renee Neary
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
12/08/1999Case stored
11/08/1999Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
11/08/1999Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/05/1999Submitted
11/02/1999Appendix to Briefs/Petition
11/02/1999Reporter's Record Filed
11/02/1999Motion Filed
11/02/1999Petition for Original Proceeding
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/08/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Shropshire, M.D., CameronReal party in interestCharles G. Bell
Fort Worth Surgery Associates d/b/a Fort Worth Surgery CenterReal party in interestJonathan C. Lamendola
Enlow, Paul WendellAppelleeHon. Paul Wendell Enlow
Ojeda, Jr., RalphAppellantMichael J. Hanners
Ojeda, RalphAppellantMichael J. Hanners
Fort Worth Anesthesia Care, P.A.Real party in interestCharles G. Bell
Kasden, M.D., ScottReal party in interestJennifer M. Owens
Ojeda, ElizabethAppellantMichael J. Hanners
Neary, ReneeAppellantMichael J. Hanners
Ojeda, DelilahAppellantMichael J. Hanners
Trial Court Information
141st District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Paul Wendell Enlow
141-179008-99