judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4520
B-4520
03/18/1974
Application for Writ of Error
INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
EDWARD C. MAURER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/23/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/12/1974Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/03/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
03/18/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/24/1974Response to Motion filed
05/23/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/13/1974Miscellaneous letter
04/19/1974Document received (See Remarks)
04/12/1974Reply to Response
04/03/1974Response to Petition
03/18/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/18/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edward C. Maurer, et al.Respondent
Insurance Company of North AmericaPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information