judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4534
B-4534
03/26/1974
Application for Writ of Error
F. WARREN HICKS, ET UX.
LOUIS B. FRAM, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/16/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/08/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
03/26/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/29/1974Response to Motion filed
05/16/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/19/1974Motion to amend application for writ of errorOverruled
04/08/1974Response to Petition
03/26/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/26/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Louis B. Fram, et ux.Respondent
F. Warren Hicks, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information