judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MATTHEW C. WHITE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-1631
Short Caption:MATTHEW C. WHITE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6767-80Filed Date:12/22/1981

Opening Event Date:12/22/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/17/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/12/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/16/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMatthew C. White N
Paul J. RileyNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Patricia A. Broderick NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WHITE, MATTHEW C. UNITED STATES
12/22/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/17/1982FiledRecord Completed
01/12/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/16/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/01/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition