judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BLETCHER (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36579
Short Caption:BLETCHER (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C115607Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice LeavittPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/05/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/16/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-14333
09/05/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-15593
11/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 00-19517
11/17/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-20213
02/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellant's counsel. Respondent shall, within 30 days of service of the opening brief and appendix, file and serve the answering brief. Appellant may then file a reply brief within 30 days of service of respondent's answering brief. 01-03516
03/16/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 03/12/01. 01-04733
03/16/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-04734
04/18/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-06616
04/18/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-06617
06/05/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-WM/CY/DA 01-19488
12/18/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19945
12/18/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2001. 01-19945