judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILSON JR., ARTHUR UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CM-0630
Short Caption:WILSON JR., ARTHUR UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:04/30/1981

Opening Event Date:04/30/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/01/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/08/1984
Argued/Submitted:05/03/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Keith Winston WattersNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
G. William Currier NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Terrence J. Keeney YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILSON JR., ARTHUR UNITED STATES
04/30/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/01/1983FiledRecord Completed
02/08/1984FiledBriefing Completed
05/03/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/10/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition