Case Description
Case ID: | 23-A-3805 - QUADRIYYAH WEBB VS M&A GIBSON INVESTMENTS LLC | |
Filing Date: | Wednesday, August 23rd, 2023 | |
Type: | SY - OTHER-SUIT | |
Status: | SACTIVE - ACTIVE |
Related Cases
No related cases were found.
Case Event Schedule
No case events were found.
Case Parties
Seq # | Assoc | Expn Date | Type | Birth Year | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 3 | PLAINTIFF 1 | WEBB, QUADRIYYAH | ||
Address: | unavailable | Aliases: | none | ||
2 | JUDGE | BOWERS, CARL W. | |||
Address: | 12 EAST PARK SQUARE MARIETTA GA 30090 | Aliases: | none | ||
3 | 1 | ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF | BARNES, JEFFREY M | ||
Address: | 7TH FLOOR 3280 PEACHTREE ROAD NE ATLANTA GA 30305 | Aliases: | none | ||
4 | DEFENDANT 1 | M&A GIBSON INVESTMENTS LLC AND | |||
Address: | 4924 SOUTH COBB DRIVE SE SMYRNA GA 30080 | Aliases: | none | ||
5 | DEFENDANT 2 | GIBSON, MARK | |||
Address: | 5320 RIVERVIEW ROAD NW SANDY SPRINGS GA 30327 | Aliases: | none | ||
Docket Entries
Filing Date | Description | Name | Monetary |
---|---|---|---|
23-AUG-2023 01:20 PM | COMPLAINT | WEBB, QUADRIYYAH | |
Entry: | none. | ||
23-AUG-2023 01:20 PM | SUMMONS ISSUED | ||
Entry: | ISSUED ON AUG 24 2023 | ||
23-AUG-2023 01:20 PM | SUMMONS ISSUED | ||
Entry: | ISSUED ON AUG 24 2023 | ||
23-AUG-2023 01:20 PM | CIVIL FILING INFORMATION FORM | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
24-AUG-2023 01:20 PM | SERVICE SENT OUT | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
24-AUG-2023 01:21 PM | SERVICE OUT/PROCESS SERVER | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
25-AUG-2023 08:24 AM | ACTIVITY SHEET PRINTED BY SHRF | ||
Entry: | Docket entry for the letter produced from CCADREQ on 25-AUG-2023. | ||
30-AUG-2023 12:00 AM | SERVICE NON EST (INCOMPLETE) | M&A GIBSON INVESTMENTS LLC AND, | |
Entry: | - INCOMPLETE ADDRESS - NO SUITE # | ||
01-SEP-2023 10:44 AM | SHERIFF ENTRY OF SERVICE FILED | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
Offenses
No offenses were found.