judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY v. T. E. LANDRUM, ET AL.

Case: A-4554
A-4554
03/10/1954
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY
T. E. LANDRUM, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/21/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/18/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/10/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/29/1954Response to Motion filed
04/21/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/18/1954Response to Petition
03/10/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/10/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas and New Orleans Railroad CompanyPetitioner
T. E. Landrum, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information