judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FARRAR, JR. (ALBERT) VS. DIRECTOR

Case Information: 36411
Short Caption:FARRAR, JR. (ALBERT) VS. DIRECTORCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/12/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/12/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandamus. 00-12024
08/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14248
10/03/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-17422
10/19/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-17500
10/19/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed October 24, 2000, and placed on the docket December 8, 2000, as Case No. 00-7378. 00-22150
02/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. (No action required.) 01-03588