judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYATT L. BEAR CLOUD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0102)
Case Number:S-11-0102Case Docketed On:04/27/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:WYATT L. BEAR CLOUD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WYATT L. BEAR CLOUD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWyatt L. Bear CloudDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig
Jeffrey Scott Pope
David L. Delicath
Theodore R. Racines

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Guilty plea, Criminal Law -Juvenile Court, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 16 Issued 2/9/2012 2013 WY 18 Issued 2/8/2013
Citation:294 P.3d 36 (Wyo. 2013)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/27/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/27/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - copy of Motion for Removal of Exhibits filed in trial courtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/13/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/14/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/26/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Second Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/12/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/23/2011Motion - Amicus - leave to participate - Motion for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief; and received proposed brief of Amicus Curiae Equal Justice Initiative in support of appellant and in support of reversal.MotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
09/23/2011Motion - Amicus - leave to participate and proposed brief of Amicus Curiae on Behalf of the American Civil Liberties Union of Wyoming in Support of Wyatt Bear CloudMotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
10/18/2011Order - Amicus - deny participation by Equal Justice Initiative and American Civil Liberties UnionOrderAmicus - deny participationFinal
10/27/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
10/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/14/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/15/2011Order - Assignment of judge - Jeffrey A. Donnell, District Judge, assigned to act in this matter for Justice Voigt who is recused.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/21/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Documents; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke, and Judge Donnell (Tina N. Olson, Appellate Counsel, Kirk Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel, argument by Mr. Morgan for appellant; Jeffrey Pope, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/09/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, District Judge Donnell writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/24/2012Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
02/24/2012Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
02/24/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's petition for rehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief in support of petition for rehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/06/2012Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
03/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/06/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/06/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 3/8/12.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/08/2012Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for Writ of Certiorari was filed on May 30, 2012 and placed on the docket for June 5, 2012 as No. 11-10616.Notice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
10/05/2012Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - No. 11-10616 - Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was granted. Judgment is vacated, and the case is remanded to the Supreme Court of Wyoming for further consideration in light of Miller v. Alabama, 567 U.S. __ (2012).Notice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
11/02/2012Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Mandate from U.S. Supreme Court received electronically, distributed to CourtRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
11/02/2012Event - Reopened caseEventOtherFinal
11/05/2012Motion - Supplemental briefingMotionSupplemental briefingFinal
11/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion Requesting Supplemental BriefingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/06/2012Order - Supplemental briefing - grantOrderSupplemental briefing - grantFinal
11/09/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/14/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Tina Olson obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jeffrey Pope obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/21/2012Brief - Supplemental appellantBriefSupplemental appellantFinal
11/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Supplemental Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/06/2012Brief - Supplemental appelleeBriefSupplemental appelleeFinal
12/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Supplemental Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/10/2012Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
12/11/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthoritiesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/12/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, on rehearing. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill Burke, Golden, Ret. and DJ Donnell (Tina N. Olson, Kirk Morgan, argument by Ms. Olson for Appellant; Jeffrey S. Pope for Appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/08/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order vacating and remanding. District Judge Donnell writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/26/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/26/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/16/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 5/15/2013 by agent for warden at WSP.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal