judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JONATHAN M. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0156
Short Caption:JONATHAN M. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-11856-10Filed Date:02/08/2011

Opening Event Date:02/08/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/11/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJonathan M. Brown Y
Montrell L. ScaifeYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Adam B. Schwartz NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/08/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/25/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Montrell L. Scaife, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/25/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Montrell L. Scaife, Esquire
03/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (49 pgs/McCarn) 11/2/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (201 pgs/McCarn) 11/3/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (237 pgs/McCarn) 11/4/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (126 pgs/McCarn) 11/8/10 proc. w/cd
06/01/2011RECORD INDEX
06/01/2011RECORD COPIES
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (SEALED documents)
06/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/25/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/25/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/29/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (aple)
08/30/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/MOTION TO FILE LODGED OPPO
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Opposition to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance Out of Time (Appellant)
12/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (85 pgs/tape) 7/2/10 proc. w/cd
12/20/2011FiledOrder Granting leave to file lodged opposition to motion for summary affirmance
12/20/2011FiledOpposition to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance (Appellant)
12/20/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
12/20/2011FiledAffirmed
12/23/2011LodgedSupplemental Record specify - #7 (11 pgs/tape) 7/2/10 proc. (corrected copy to SR#6)
01/11/2012FiledMandate