judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARCIA BECKWITH v. KARL AND TINA WEBER, husband and wife, dba GROS VENTRE RIVER RANCH

Case Heading (S-11-0101)
Parent:S-11-0101Case Docketed On:04/25/2011
Consolidated: S-11-0245
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:MARCIA BECKWITH v. KARL AND TINA WEBER, husband and wife, dba GROS VENTRE RIVER RANCH
Full Title:MARCIA BECKWITH, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. KARL AND TINA WEBER, husband and wife, dba GROS VENTRE RIVER RANCH, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarcia BeckwithGerard R. Bosch
AppelleeKarl WeberKatherine Lamere Mead
AppelleeTina WeberKatherine Lamere Mead
AppelleeGros Ventre River RanchKatherine Lamere Mead

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Costs, Negligence, Trial - Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2012 WY 62
Citation:277 P.3d 713

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/25/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received (Clerk faxed copy of NOA with attachements)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
04/25/2011Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
04/25/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/02/2011Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
06/13/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellee.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/30/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/30/2011Order - Grant - extension of time to file Appellees briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Reporter's certificate of transcript of November 2010 trial proceedings.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/26/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
08/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
08/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/13/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/23/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Transcripts and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/14/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/18/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
11/18/2011Order - Assignment of judgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gerard R. Bosch for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Katherine Mead for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/14/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke and District Judge Davis (Gerard R. Bosh for appellant; Katherine Mead for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/14/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/30/2012Order - Consolidating cases for decisionOrderConsolidating casesFinal
02/15/2012Order - Assignment of judge - Michael K. Davis, District Judge, is assigned to act in this matter for Chief Justice Kite who is recused.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
04/25/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, District Judge Davis writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/01/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
05/04/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees/Defendants' Motion for Costs; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/22/2012Order - Awarding costsOrderAwarding costsFinal
05/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/22/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/29/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 5/25/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal